Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDefense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. v. US Department of Education
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityOrlando
Case Number6:2023cv01695
Date Filed2023-09-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Roy B. Dalton, Jr.
PlaintiffDefense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Education for records concerning the agency's role in diluting the federal Desegregation of Public Education. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told DFIPS that the requests were too broad to search. After hearing nothing further from the agency, DFIPS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS Department of Education
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-051COMPLAINT against Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-21213759) filed by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Exhibits A-1 through B-4)(Astor, Martha) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-052NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:23-cv-1695-RBD-EJK. (ARC) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-053MOTION for Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21217009 for $150 by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.. (Astor, Martha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-054NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc.. Related case(s): Yes (Astor, Martha) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-055CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. for Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc... (Astor, Martha) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-066ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/6/2023. (JOR) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-067Remark: Doc. 5 has been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/6/2023. (JWG) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-068SUMMONS issued as to US Department of Education. (ABC) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-069ORDER granting 3 Plaintiff's Motion for Special Admission of Donald A. Daugherty, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/6/2023. (RMN) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-1110INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/11/2023. (ALL) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-1811CERTIFICATE of service by Defense of Freedom Institute for Policy Studies, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Mailing Envelope)(Astor, Martha) (Entered: 09/18/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar