Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJP Darby Services LLC v. United States Department of Labor
DistrictEastern District of Texas
CityBeaumont
Case Number1:2023cv00331
Date Filed2023-09-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Michael J. Truncale
PlaintiffJP Darby Services LLC
Case DescriptionJP Darby Services submitted a FOIA request to the Mine Health and Safety Administration for records. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, JP Darby Services filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Labor Julie Su - Acting Secretary
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-051COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against United States Department of Labor, filed by JP Darby Services LLC.(bjc, ) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-05Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 100021790 (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-05CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-112CERTIFICATE of Service by JP Darby Services LLC (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-133NOTICE of certificate of service by JP Darby Services LLC (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-144ORDERED that the Clerk of Court deliver a summons and the complaint to the Plaintiff so that he may serve the Defendant. Ordered that Plaintiff shall properly effectuate service of a summons and complaint, with attached exhibits, upon the Defendant promptly, and in no event later than 90 days after this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zack Hawthorn on 9/14/2023. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-145Summons issued as to United States Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and mailed to plaintiff for service. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-206SUMMONS Returned Executed by JP Darby Services LLC. US Attorney personally served on 9/20/2023, answer due 11/20/2023. (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-267SUMMONS Returned Executed by JP Darby Services LLC. Julie Su - Acting Secretary of Labor served by priority mail express on 9/22/2023 (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-09-268SUMMONS Returned Executed by JP Darby Services LLC. US Attorney General served by priority mail express on 9/21/2023 (bjc, ) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar