Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK v. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02586
Date Filed2023-09-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffINFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK
Case DescriptionInformed Consent Action Network submitted two FOIA requests to the National Institute of Health for records. The first FOIA request asked for emails sent to or received by Dr. Francis Collins that include Jeremy Farrar in the to/from line. ICAN also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied ICAN's request for expedited processing. ICAN's second FOIA request asked for emails sent to or from Anthony Fauci that include Jeremy Farrar's name in the to/from line of the email. ICAN also requested expedited processing for that request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied ICAN's request for expedited processing. ICAN then filed suit challenging the denial of expedited processing.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing - Compelling Need, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-061COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10330383) filed by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons to NIH, # 9 Summons to USAO, # 10 Summons to USAG)(Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-063NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Siri on behalf of INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-06Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zljn) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-064SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-115MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- R. Scott Pietrowski, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-10342468. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/11/2023)
2023-09-196RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/7/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/7/2023. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-197RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/11/2023. (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-198RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF HEALTH served on 9/11/2023 (Brehm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-229ENTERED IN ERROR.....Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by INFORMED CONSENT ACTION NETWORK. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Statement of Facts, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Brehm, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/22/2023 (ztth). (Entered: 09/22/2023)
2023-09-22NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 9 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment . The following error(s) need correction: Document filed in the incorrect case. (ztth) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar