Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02591
Date Filed2023-09-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffNATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC.
PlaintiffFERNANDO ALFONSO III an individual
Case DescriptionFernando Alphonso, an editor at NPR, submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning the treatment of Ghislaine Maxwell's detention at the Brooklyn Metropolitan Detention Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied it under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). NPR filed an administrative appeal of the denial. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NPR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-061COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10329739) filed by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC., FERNANDO ALFONSO III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Summons Fed. Bureau of Prisons, # 8 Summons Attorney General, # 9 Summons US Attorney, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL PUBLIC RADIO, INC. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-07Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zcb) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 09/07/2023)
2023-09-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/8/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2023. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-145RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 9/12/2022 (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
2023-09-146RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/14/2023. (Kelley, Matthew) (Entered: 09/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar