Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDOE 3 v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Maine
CityPortland
Case Number2:2023cv00358
Date Filed2023-09-21
Date Closed2024-01-05
JudgeJUDGE JON D. LEVY
PlaintiffJANE DOE 3
Case DescriptionJane Doe 3 filed suit against the Executive Office of the President. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT
DefendantLLOYD J AUSTIN, III Secretary of Defense
DefendantJOHN DOES 1 - 10
DefendantJANE DOES 1-10
DefendantFOREIGN NATIONS 1-10
DefendantLEGAL ENTITIES 1-10
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [3]
Opinion/Order [8]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-211COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR AN INJUNCTION against LLOYD J AUSTIN, III, JANE DOES 1-10, JOHN DOES 1 - 10, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, LEGAL ENTITIES 1-10, FOREIGN NATIONS 1-10 PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by JANE DOE 3. (Service of Process Deadline 12/21/2023) Fee due by 9/25/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Endnote 29 (a), # 2 Endnote 29 (b), # 3 Endnotes 27, 28, 30, 44, 67, 87, 89, 114, 116, 120, 121, 122, 136, 137, 138, 139, # 4 Endnotes 5, 6, 7, 8, 15, 16, 45, 46, 47, 54, 60, 61, 133, 134, 135)(cjd) Modified on 9/27/2023 to add defendant Legal Entities(cjd). (Entered: 09/22/2023)
2023-09-212CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
2023-09-22Filing Fee Received from JANE DOE 3: Amount Paid: 402. Receipt Number: 2631. Method of Payment: Credit Card. Purpose of Payment: Filing fee. Date Paid: 9/22/2023 (cjd) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
2023-10-023REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint. Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-164MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Recommended Decision After Review of Complaint by JANE DOE 3 (Attachments: # 1 Email Received 10/16/2023 to the ECF Inbox)(clp) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-165ORDER granting 4 Motion to Extend Time to File Objection to Recommended Decision. Time is extended to November 6, 2023. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-16Reset Deadlines as to 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re 1 Complaint per order no. 5: Objections to R&R due by 11/6/2023 (clp) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-196ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS received via USPS filed by JANE DOE 3 re 4 Motion to Extend Time.. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(clp) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-11-067Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re 3 Report and Recommended Decision. filed by JANE DOE 3. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 11/20/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Email Received 11/6/2023 to ECF Inbox)(clp) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/7/2023) (clp). (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2024-01-058ORDER ACCEPTING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE and COK WARNING accepting 3 Report and Recommended Decision re 1 Complaint By JUDGE JON D. LEVY. (clp) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-01-059JUDGMENT - By DEPUTY CLERK: Charity Pelletier. (clp) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar