Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02883
Date Filed2023-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionFederation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning emails to or from Kerry Doyle mentioning deportation. FAIR also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantIMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-281COMPLAINT against U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10385117) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-282NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James O'Brien on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-283LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-29Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zrtw) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-09-294SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-11-025RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2023. (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-026RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/18/2023. (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-027RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 10/17/2023 (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-148Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
2023-11-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/15/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-12-149ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-15MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file, by December 27, 2023, a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/15/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-2610Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2023-12-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file, by February 27, 2024, a further joint status report. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/31/2023. (lctjk3) (Entered: 12/31/2023)
2024-02-2611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 02/26/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar