Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02887
Date Filed2023-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionProfessional Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Land Management for records from the Pecoes District Office concerning the Lesser Prairie-Chicken timing stipulations. PEER also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PEER's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Defendant2255
BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-281COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10386131) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons for Agency, # 3 Summons Summons for AG, # 4 Summons Summons for USATTY DC)(Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Mercola, Monica) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-29Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-09-293SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-11-024NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-025ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT.(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 11/02/2023)
2023-11-036ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before November 17, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/3/2023. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/03/2023)
2023-11-177Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
2023-11-20MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before January 17, 2024, which advises whether any disputed issues remain and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2024. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
2024-01-178Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 01/17/2024)
2024-01-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report on or before March 18, 2024, which advises whether any dispute remains with respect to Plaintiff's claim for fees and, if so, proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/18/2024. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/18/2024)
2024-01-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/18/2024. (smc) (Entered: 01/18/2024)
2024-01-259NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Peter T. Jenkins on behalf of PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY Substituting for attorney Monica Mercola (Jenkins, Peter) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar