Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGlancy Prongay and Murray LLP v. Federal Aviation Administration
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2023cv08119
Date Filed2023-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark C. Scarsi
PlaintiffGlancy Prongay and Murray LLP
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Glancy Prongay & Murray submitted two FOIA requests to the Federal Aviation Administration for records. The agency acknowledged the first request. The agency denied the request. The law firm filed an administrative appeal. The law firm filed a second request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the second request but after hearing nothing further from the agency concerning either request, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Aviation Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-281COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36123723 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Attorney Garth A. Spencer added to party Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP(pty:pla))(Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-282Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-283Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-284Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-285CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP. (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-286NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP, (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-287NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-288NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-289Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-09-281030 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons) (lh) (Entered: 09/28/2023)
2023-10-0211PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP, upon Defendant Federal Aviation Administration served on 9/29/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Richard Childers, Civil Intake Clerk. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-0912PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP, upon Defendant Federal Aviation Administration served on 10/4/2023, answer due 11/3/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Richard Childers, Civil Intake Clerk. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Chris Stevenson, Team Lead for Policy, Audit, and Evaluation & Authorized Agent of Federal Aviation Administration. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 10/09/2023)
2023-10-1713PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Glancy Prongay and Murray LLP, upon Defendant Federal Aviation Administration served on 10/10/2023, answer due 11/9/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Richard Childers, Civil Intake Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Certified Mail - Attorney General of the United States. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Chris Stevenson, Team Lead for Policy, Audit, and Evaluation & Authorized Agent of Federal Aviation Administration. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Spencer, Garth) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2023-10-2014STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration.(Attorney Randy Hsieh added to party Federal Aviation Administration(pty:dft))(Hsieh, Randy) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-2515ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-08119-MCS (Ex). (et) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-10-2516INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (pc) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-11-0917ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration.(Hsieh, Randy) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-0918ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-12-2219JOINT RULE 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. (Hsieh, Randy) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-2620NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Report 19 by Defendant Federal Aviation Administration. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2024-01-0321TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on January 8, 2024 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-0522SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: Defendant's deadline to file and serve a Vaughn Index/Declaration April 4, 2024; Defendant's deadline to file and serve motion for summary judgment: May 6, 2024; Plaintiff's deadline to file anopposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment: June 4, 2024; Defendant's deadline to file a reply in support of its motion for summary judgment: June 18, 2024; Hearing on motion for summary judgment: July 22, 2024, at 9:00 AM. The Court will set additional dates, if necessary, after deciding the motion for summary judgment. (lc) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar