Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZORN v. UNITED STATES HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02894
Date Filed2023-09-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffMATTHEW C. ZORN
Case DescriptionMatthew Zorn submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning a letter on marijuana scheduling for Secretary Xavier Becerra that was seen by Bloomberg News. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Zorn filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Defendant2255
UNITED STATES HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-291COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10387717) filed by MATTHEW C. ZORN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zorn, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2023)
2023-10-02NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to mzorn@yettercoleman.com, cc'd 1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zrtw, ) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-022ERRATA of Original Complaint (Dkt. 1) by MATTHEW C. ZORN re 1 Complaint, Notice of QC- New Case,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Summons, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zorn, Matthew) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-02Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrtw) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-023SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-11-094MOTION for Summary Judgment by MATTHEW C. ZORN. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of M. Zorn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Zorn, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-145NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar