Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBARTH v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02920
Date Filed2023-09-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJOHN S. BARTH
Case DescriptionJohn Barth submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning criminal allegations about a political party. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Barth filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantHOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-09-281COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 205679) filed by JOHN S. BARTH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjm) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-09-28SUMMONS (4) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, and U.S. Attorney. (zjm) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-09-282MOTION for CM/ECF Password by JOHN S. BARTH. (zjm) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-11-243ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/24/23. (DM) (Entered: 11/24/2023)
2023-11-27MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 2 Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password. Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure a "pro se party may obtain a CM/ECF user name and password from the Clerk with leave of Court." The decision whether to grant the motion "is within the discretion of the judge to whom the case is assigned." The motion must describe the party's access to the internet and certify that he "either has successfully completed the entire Clerk's Office on-line tutorial or has been permitted to file electronically in other federal courts." LCvR 5.4(b)(2). Plaintiff has included the appropriate information in his 2 Motion, stating that he has regular access to the Internet and has completed the on-line tutorial. However, in the short history of this case so far, Plaintiff has demonstrated sufficient ability to file pleadings on the docket. Therefore, in an exercise of the Court's discretion, Plaintiff's 2 Motion for CM/ECF User Name and Password is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE . The Clerk of Court will continue to mail copies of docket entries to Plaintiff, and, if necessary, Chambers will provide courtesy copies via email. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this minute order to Plaintiff at his address of record . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 27, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
2024-01-024Rule 4(m) Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff at their address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 2, 2024. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party due by 2/15/2024. (dot) (Entered: 01/02/2024)
2024-01-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/03/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 1/3/2024; HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS served on 1/2/2024; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/3/2024, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/6/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/5/2024.) (zjm) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-176MOTION to Provide Summons by JOHN S. BARTH. (zjm) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-01-177REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by JOHN S. BARTH.(zjm) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-01-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/03/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS served on 1/4/2024 (zjm) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-01-22SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney (zjm) (Entered: 01/22/2024)
2024-01-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the docket, it appears that the relief Plaintiff seeks in his 6 Second Motion to Issue Summons has been obtained. Summons was issued on January 22, 2024. Accordingly, the Court shall DENY AS MOOT Plaintiff's 6 Second Motion to Issue Summons. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this minute order to Plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/23/2024. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-02-089RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/31/2024. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/1/2024. (zjm) (Entered: 02/08/2024)
2024-02-1210NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of All Defendants (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 02/12/2024)
2024-02-1211CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE . (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 02/12/2024)
2024-02-1212NOTICE of Consent by JOHN S. BARTH (zjm) (Entered: 02/14/2024)
2024-02-1413Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, HOMELAND SECURITY INVESTIGATIONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 02/14/2024)
2024-02-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Therein, Defendants request that the Court extend the deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by thirty days. Counsel for Defendants explains that additional time is required to "discuss this matter with the relevant agency, explore whether this case may be resolved without litigation, and if not, formulate Defendants' response to" the Complaint. In light of Plaintiff's consent, and upon good cause shown, the Court shall GRANT Defendants' 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before April 1, 2024 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/15/2024. (lcckk1) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
2024-02-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 4/1/2024. (dot) (Entered: 02/15/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar