Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGIBBONS et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02921
Date Filed2023-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffCHARLES GIBBONS
PlaintiffDEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT
Case DescriptionCharles Gibbons and Defending Rights & Dissent submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records on William O'Neal, who was deceased. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Gibbons filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-021COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10391587) filed by CHARLES GIBBONS, DEFENDING RIGHTS & DISSENT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons OUSA, # 4 Summons DOJ)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-03Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zcb) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-032SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-053STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 5, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-11-074NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-095Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to Plaintiffs' Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar