Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Tennessee v. Mayorkas et al
DistrictMiddle District of Tennessee
CityColumbia
Case Number1:2023cv00068
Date Filed2023-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge William L. Campbell, Jr
PlaintiffState of Tennessee
Case DescriptionThe State of Tennessee submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the planned release of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement detainees in Tennessee. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the State of Tennessee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantAlejandro Mayorkas in his official capacity as Secretary of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
DefendantPatrick Lechleitner in his official capacity as Deputy Director and Senior Official Performing the Duties of the Director of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantAttorney General Merrick Garland
DefendantU.S. Attorney Henry C. Leventis
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-021COMPLAINT against Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3923675), filed by State of Tennessee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 First FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 Second FOIA Request, # 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(kc) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-022NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-023NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-02TN State Bar status verified as active for Steven James Griffin, Whitney Downs Hermandorfer admitted to this court . (kc) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-024NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 11/9/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (kc) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-10-035Summons Issued as to Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-036ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 10/3/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (af) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-277ORDER: This case is scheduled for an initial case management conference on November 9, 2023. See Notice at Docket No. 4 . However, Defendants will have 60 days from the date of service of process, the summons for which were issued on October 3, 2023 (Docket No. 5 ), to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. To allow time for service of process on Defendants and for Defendants to respond to the complaint, the initial case management conference is RESCHEDULED for January 2, 2024, at 2:00 p.m. (CT) using the Court's conference line at 1-877-402-9753, access code 3808663#. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 10/27/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (mg) (Entered: 10/27/2023)
2023-11-038SUMMONS returned executed by State of Tennessee. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 10/16/2023. (Griffin, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2023)
2023-11-039SUMMONS returned executed by State of Tennessee. Patrick Lechleitner served on 10/13/2023. (Griffin, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2023)
2023-11-0310SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Attorney General Merrick Garland on 10/16/23 by State of Tennessee. (Griffin, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2023)
2023-11-0311SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney Henry C. Leventis on 10/10/23 by State of Tennessee. (Griffin, Steven) (Entered: 11/03/2023)
2023-11-1312MOTION for attorney Bradley Philip Humphreys to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Fee waived) by Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (hb) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
2023-11-1313CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING of Attorney Bradley P. Humphreys from the United States District Court for the District of Columbia filed by Patrick Lechleitner, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (hb) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar