Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBERNSTEIN v. NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02938
Date Filed2023-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffDANIEL J. BERNSTEIN
Case DescriptionDaniel Bernstein, a professor of computer science at the University of Illinois at Chicago, submitted a FOIA request to the National Institute of Standards for records concerning the NIST Post-Quantum Cryptography Standardization Project. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Bernstein filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantNATIONAL INSTITUTE OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-031COMPLAINT against NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10394655) filed by DANIEL J. BERNSTEIN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-032NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of DANIEL J. BERNSTEIN (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-033SEALED DOCUMENT filed by DANIEL J. BERNSTEIN(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-034NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of DANIEL J. BERNSTEIN (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-04Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsl) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-045SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE served on 10/12/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-10-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/17/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-10-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/5/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/4/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-11-019NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/01/2023)
2023-11-0610ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/06/2023)
2023-11-0711ORDER directing parties to file joint status report on or before December 4, 2023 . Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 6, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2023. (dot) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar