Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02943
Date Filed2023-10-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request o the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning communications of the National Counterterrorism Center regarding the Foreign Malign Influence Center. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. V After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-031COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10395652) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons ODNI)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-032LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-03NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to jaldrich@judicialwatch.org, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zrtw, ) (Entered: 10/03/2023)
2023-10-04Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zrtw) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-043SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/12/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/11/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/25/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 10/25/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-11-135ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar