Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-03 | 1 | New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the national and circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 2 | Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 4 | COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against United States Department of Labor filed by Jason Ashley. (Filing fee $402.00; Receipt number 300008025) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 5 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jason Ashley. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (agc) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 6 | Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Jason Ashley. (agc) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-03 | 7 | Summons issued as to United States Department of Labor, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (agc) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 3 | Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/4/2023) (agc) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2, 3. Electronic Order Wed Oct 4 14:36:59 CDT 2023 (crt) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 8 | Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (ndt) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 9 | Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3-23-cv-2195-39BK. (frw) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 10 | ANSWER to 4 Complaint,, filed by United States Department of Labor. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Andrea L Hyatt added to party United States Department of Labor(pty:dft) (Hyatt, Andrea) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 11 | NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L Hyatt on behalf of United States Department of Labor. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Hyatt, Andrea) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 12 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Department of Labor. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hyatt, Andrea) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 13 | Proof of Service for Summons. (Ashley, Jason) Modified text on 11/8/2023 (cfk). (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-07 | 14 | SCHEDULING PROPOSALS ORDER: Counsel and any unrepresented party must submit a Joint Scheduling Proposal that contains the matters set forth in paragraph IV. The Joint Scheduling Proposal is due within 30 days of the date of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/7/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 11/07/2023) |
2023-11-07 | 15 | NOTICE OF OPTION TO CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 11/7/2023) (mcrd) (Entered: 11/07/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |