Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02960
Date Filed2023-10-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning aggression and bites by the Biden's dog Commander. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Judicial Watch that a search had been completed. However, after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10399741) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-05Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-054STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 5, 2023. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-265RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/12/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/11/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/19/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/16/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-11-096ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Snyder, Hilarie) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-09MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before November 30, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 9, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar