Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-04 | 1 | RECEIVED Complaint for declaratory and emergency injunctive relief by James Chelmowski. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 2 | RECEIVED EXHIBITS by James Chelmowski. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 3 | CIVIL Cover Sheet. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | 4 | ORDER: Local Rule 3.3 requires that any document submitted for filing for which a filing fee is required must be accompanied either by the appropriate fee or an In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit. No filing fee or IFP petition was submitted at the time of filing this matter. James Chelmowski is directed to pay the required filing fee or submit a completed In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit within 15 days of this notification. Pursuant to LR 3.3(f), failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions, including dismissal of the action by the assigned judge. Signed by the Executive Committee. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached Consent To form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-04 | | MAILED CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), Consent form, Local Rule 3.3, IFP form to James Chelmowski. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 5 | MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff has filed a complaint but has not paid the filing fee and also has not filed an application to proceed in forma pauperis (i.e. without prepaying the filing fee). Unless plaintiff does one or the other by 10/20/2023 the Court will dismiss the case for nonpayment of the filing fee. Mailed notice. (mma, ) (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-11 | | SUMMONS Issued as to Federal Communication Commission, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (smb, ) (Entered: 10/11/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |