Alvarez Gomez v. United States Department Of Justice et al
District
Eastern District of Virginia
City
Norfolk
Case Number
2:2023cv00494
Date Filed
2023-10-04
Date Closed
Open
Judge
District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen
Plaintiff
Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez
Case Description
Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Alvarez Gomez filed suit. Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees
Defendant
United States Department Of Justice
Defendant
Merrick Garland Attorney General of the United States in his official capcity
Defendant
Federal Bureau of Prisons
Defendant
Colette S. Peters Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons in her official capacity
Complaint (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Initial FOIA request, # 3 Exhibit Acknowledgement of FOIA request, # 4 Exhibit Notice of Hearing Immigration Court)(Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-04
2
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elyssa Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Alina Kilpatrick Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9156917. by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Attachments: # 1 Pro hac vice application form)(Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-04
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) (Entered: 10/04/2023)
2023-10-05
Notice of Correction re 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Elyssa Williams and Certification of Local Counsel Alina Kilpatrick Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9156917. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. The motion filed also indicates that the applicant is a full-time employee of the United States of America requesting exemption from the filing fee. Local counsel should refile the motion with the corrected information including the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (tlev, ) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-06
3
Proposed Summons by Juan Carlos Alvarez Gomez. (Kilpatrick, Alina) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-06
4
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons, the attached procedure for Civil Motions and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA. (Attachments: # 1 Procedure for Civil Motions)(dbra, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-19
5
Certificate Reporting Service by United States Department Of Justice. United States Department Of Justice served on 10/16/2023, answer due 12/15/2023. (Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-11-13
6
ANSWER to Complaint by Federal Bureau of Prisons, Merrick Garland, Colette S. Peters, United States Department Of Justice.(Jansen, Sean) (Entered: 11/13/2023)