Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02964
Date Filed2023-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning modifications to the eligibility of Hungarian citizens to participate in the in the visa waiver program which went into effect August 1, 2023. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10400947) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. State Dept., # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-052LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/5/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-05Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zrtw) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-11-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/16/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/15/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 10/23/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar