Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-05 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10402305) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US Department of Justice) (Aldrich, Jason) Modified it reflect filing attorney on 10/6/2023 (zcb). (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-05 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) Modified to reflect filing attorney on 10/6/2023 (zcb). (Entered: 10/05/2023) |
2023-10-06 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zcb) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-06 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/06/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 4 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/13/23. (DM) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-11-08 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/12/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/11/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/21/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2023) |
2023-11-17 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Goodnature, Taisa) (Entered: 11/17/2023) |
2023-11-17 | 7 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Goodnature, Taisa) (Entered: 11/17/2023) |
2023-11-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 7 Unopposed Motion for a Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant requests the Court for a nunc pro tunc extension of its deadline to file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint from November 13 to November 17, 2023. In light of Plaintiff's consent, the Court hereby GRANTS Defendant's 7 Unopposed Motion for a Nunc Pro Tunc Extension of the Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 17, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/17/2023) |
2023-11-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/17/2023. (dot) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-20 | 8 | ORDER instructing the parties to file a Joint Status Report on or before January 4, 2024 . See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 20, 2023. (lcckk1) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-11-20 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2024. (dot) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |