Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJasi v. U.S. Citizen and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityGreenbelt
Case Number8:2023cv02702
Date Filed2023-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Deborah K. Chasanow
PlaintiffKaren Johana Jasi
Case DescriptionKaren Jasi submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning her Alien file. The agency acknowledged request of the requests. After hearing nothing further from either agency Jasi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUSCIS
DefendantU.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
DefendantICE
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
DefendantExecutive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR)
DefendantEOIR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10856057.), filed by KAREN JOHANNA JASI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit USCIS FOIA, # 2 Exhibit EOIR FOIA, # 3 Exhibit ICE FOIA, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons)(GARCIA, DAVID) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-062Your document has been accepted as filed. No corrective action is required in regard to this filing. Pursuant to Local Rule 102.2., a complaint caption shall contain the names and addresses of all parties and the county of residence.(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/07/2023)
2023-10-103Summons Issued 60 days as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-104QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint, filed by Karen Johana Jasi was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Propose summons for defendant Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR). To correct this problem, file Propose summons for defendant Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR) using the event Notice (Other) and link Propose summons to 1 Complaint. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-105NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Gina L. Simms. Karen Johana Jasi or counsel for Karen Johana Jasi are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded here . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded here , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/24/2023. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-106Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms on 10/10/2023. (heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-118NOTICE by Karen Johana Jasi re 1 Complaint, (GARCIA, DAVID) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-129Summons Issued 60 days as to Executive Office for Immigration Review (EOIR) (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/12/2023)
2023-10-2010SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen Johana Jasi. All Defendants.(GARCIA, DAVID) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-11-07Case Reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Gina L Simms no longer assigned to the case. (mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-1412Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelton, Alicia) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
2023-11-1413PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING 12 consent motion for extension of time. Defendants' response to Plaintiff's complaint is now due by December 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/14/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
2023-11-1414PAPERLESS ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to reset the link to the exhibits attached to Plaintiff's complaint (ECF No. 1) so that non-court users may not electronically access them and DIRECTING Plaintiff's counsel to re-file the exhibits in accordance with this courts Privacy Policy. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 11/14/2023. (sat, Chambers) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar