Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company v. Federal Bureau Of Investigation
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv08756
Date Filed2023-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Vernon S. Broderick
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
Case DescriptionThe New York Times submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning the presentation made by identified FBI agents entitled Multimedia Evidence Tools on the Digital Content Analysis Platform. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the New York Times filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau Of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-051COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau Of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28387367)Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-052CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-053REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-054RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York Times Company..(McCraw, David) (Entered: 10/05/2023)
2023-10-06CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(pc) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-06Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-06Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-065ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(pc) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-11-136CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sarah Normand dated 11/13/2023. Document filed by Federal Bureau Of Investigation..(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar