Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02979
Date Filed2023-10-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffWESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER
Case DescriptionWestern Environmental Law Center submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Energy. The first requested asked for records concerning the WISHH hydrogen hub application. The second request asked for records concerning the SHINe hydrogen hub application. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency concerning either request, WELC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10404605) filed by WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Energy, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General)(Tisdel, Kyle) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-062LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER (Tisdel, Kyle) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-06Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsl) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsl) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-064NOTICE of Errata by WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Errata Complaint)(Tisdel, Kyle) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-11-215NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Levy on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Levy, Brian) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-216Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-22MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant must respond to the complaint by December 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/22/2023. (lcabj1) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar