Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCATO INSTITUTE v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02981
Date Filed2023-10-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffCATO INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Cato Institute submitted two FOIA requests to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning all employees, and information about their employment. The second request was for records on arrests. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Cato Institute filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-061COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10405186) filed by CATO INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-062NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-063NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of CATO INSTITUTE (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-10Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zcb) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-104SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-105STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/10/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-316RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 10/16/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-10-317RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/16/2023 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-10-318RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/19/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-10-319RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/11/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/10/2023. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2023)
2023-11-1310ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar