Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNOVAK v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv02989
Date Filed2023-10-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffVIVECA NOVAK
Case DescriptionViveca Novak submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records about her mother's employment by the agency after World War II. Novak asked for inclusion in the news media category. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Novak filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-061COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10406150) filed by VIVECA NOVAK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons CIA, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-10Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (znmw) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-10NOTICE OF ERROR re 1 Complaint; emailed to brad@markzaid.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing/incorrect summonses. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to issue., 2. Resubmit FOIA summonses.(znmw, ) Modified on 10/10/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-122REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by VIVECA NOVAK. (Attachments: # 1 Summons CIA, # 2 Summons USADC, # 3 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 10/12/2023)
2023-10-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmw) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-11-154NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-155NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Zaid on behalf of VIVECA NOVAK (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-166MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-16MINUTE ORDER: Granting Defendant's 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due December 20, 2023. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/16/2023. (lcd) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/20/2023. (zed) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar