Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc. v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2023cv08790
Date Filed2023-10-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Valerie E. Caproni
PlaintiffInternational Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.
Case DescriptionInternational Refugee Assistance Project submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and the Department of State for records concerning the Iraqi DAP program, which allows Iraqis who cooperated with the U.S. during the war to immediately request resettlement. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, IRAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-061COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28391728)Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A USCIS FOIA, # 2 Exhibit Ex B USCIS Letter, # 3 Exhibit Ex C DOS FOIA).(Akay Alp, Mevlude) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-062CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Akay Alp, Mevlude) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-063RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Akay Alp, Mevlude) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-064FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Akay Alp, Mevlude) Modified on 10/10/2023 (jgo). (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-065FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Akay Alp, Mevlude) Modified on 10/10/2023 (jgo). (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(jgo) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-10Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (jgo) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-10Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-10***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Mevlude Amina Akay Alp to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; use the Freedom of Information Act summons form;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-106REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Akay Alp, Mevlude) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-107REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Akay Alp, Mevlude) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-118ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (sj) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-119ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (sj) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-1110NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/15/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/11/2023) (tg) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-1311NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mariko Hirose on behalf of International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc...(Hirose, Mariko) (Entered: 10/13/2023)
2023-10-2612SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/19/2023, answer due 11/9/2023; United States Department of State served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by International Refugee Assistance Project, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed as to United States Department of State).(Akay Alp, Mevlude) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar