Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleChelmowski v. National Archives and Records Administration
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2023cv14577
Date Filed2023-10-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Nancy L. Maldonado
PlaintiffJames Chelmowski
Case DescriptionJames Chelmowski submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Chelmowski filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration ("NARA")
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-051RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by James Chelmowski. (Exhibits) (ph, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-052CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-05CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (ph, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-06CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached Consent To form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (ph, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-06MAILED copy of the Clerk's Notice entry along with the Joint Consent Form to Plaintiff James Chelmowski. (ph, ) (Entered: 10/06/2023)
2023-10-103MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado:This case has been assigned to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. The Court notes that, based on a review of the docket, no filing fee has been paid and no application to proceed in forma pauperis has been filed. Plaintiff must pay the requisite filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis by 10/30/2023. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-11SUMMONS Issued as to National Archives and Records Administration, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (smb, ) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-115COMPLAINT filed by James Chelmowski (Exhibits) (jg, ) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-126MINUTE entry before the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 01/10/24 at 10:00 a.m. in person in Courtroom 1925. By 01/03/24, the parties shall file a joint Initial Status Report that complies with the Court's standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. (ca, ) (Entered: 10/12/2023)
2023-10-277MAIL RETURNED, for document # 6 sent to James Chelmowski returned as undeliverable, return to sender. No new contact information received; therefore future mailings will not be sent until a new address is provided to the Clerk's Office using a Notification of Change of Address or Pro Se Appearance form (axk, ) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar