Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03001
Date Filed2023-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Disease Control for records concerning the drafting and publishing of guidance for breast-feeding by transgender individuals. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10408748) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of Health and Human Services, # 3 Summons US Atty for DC, # 4 Summons US Atty General)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/11/2023) (zcb). (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-11Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcb) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-10-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/11/2023)
2023-11-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 10/25/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Blankenberg, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-11-105Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, (Or to Otherwise Respond) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/10/2023)
2023-11-13MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Defendant's response to the complaint shall now be due on or before January 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/13/23. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/13/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar