Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-10 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10408872) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons US Atty for DC, # 4 Summons US Atty General)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/10/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-10 | | Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zrtw) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-10 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 10/10/2023) |
2023-10-13 | 4 | STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 13, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/13/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlin Kerry Eckrote on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | 6 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eckrote, Kaitlin) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before December 18, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge Carl J. Nichols on November 6, 2023. (lccjn1) (Entered: 11/06/2023) |
2023-11-08 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/21/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/21/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Blankenberg, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/08/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |