Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03004
Date Filed2023-10-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning payments made to Twitter. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of the records, citing Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods or techniques). Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal. The Office of Information Policy remanded the request back to the FBI for further searching. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10408936) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons US Atty for DC, # 4 Summons US Atty General)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-102LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/10/2023) (zrtw). (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-10Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zrtw) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-11-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/13/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/12/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/23/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/23/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Blankenberg, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-11-095Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bardo, John) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-09MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) The Consent 5 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and (2) Defendant shall file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 13, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/9/2023. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/13/2023. (znbn) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar