Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-10 | 1 | COMPLAINT against US Air Force ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIDDC-2641070.), filed by Idaho Conservation League. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Lucas, Laurence) |
2023-10-10 | 2 | MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Elizabeth H. Potter. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number AIDDC-2641086.)Laurence J Lucas appearing for Plaintiff Idaho Conservation League. Responses due by 10/31/2023 (Lucas, Laurence) |
2023-10-10 | 3 | Corporate Disclosure Statement by Idaho Conservation League. (Lucas, Laurence) |
2023-10-11 | 4 | DOCKET ENTRY ORDER APPROVING (Dkt. 2 ) Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Elizabeth Hunter Potter for Idaho Conservation League Per Local Rule 83.4(e), out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm) |
2023-10-11 | 5 | Summons Issued as to US Air Force. (Print attached Summons for service.) (lm) |
2023-10-26 | 6 | LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on January 11, 2024, at 10:00 AM. On or before January 4, 2024, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm) |
2023-11-08 | 7 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time Within Which to Respond to the Complaint Christine Gealy England appearing for Defendant US Air Force. Responses due by 11/29/2023 (England, Christine) |
2023-11-09 | 8 | ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion (Dkt. 7 ) is GRANTED and the deadline for Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Complaint is HEREBY EXTENDED until on or before December 13, 2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Debora K Grasham. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm) |
2023-11-09 | 9 | NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Idaho Conservation League, US Air Force re 7 Motion for Extension of Time 8 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, 1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 1/8/2024. (lm) |
Hide Docket Events |