Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-12 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by America First Policy Institute. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-14097798) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements and Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) (Steinmann, Jessica) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-12 | 2 | CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by America First Policy Institute. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Steinmann, Jessica) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-12 | 3 | New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-12 | 4 | Summons issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (sre) (Entered: 10/12/2023) |
2023-10-24 | 5 | NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Elizabeth Hart Steinmann for H. Dustin Fillmore III on behalf of America First Policy Institute. (Steinmann, Jessica) (Entered: 10/24/2023) |
2023-11-08 | 6 | Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number BTXNDC-14162286) filed by America First Policy Institute (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)Attorney Jase Panebianco added to party America First Policy Institute(pty:pla) (Panebianco, Jase) (Entered: 11/08/2023) |
2023-11-09 | 7 | ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jase Panebianco. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/9/2023) (JAF) (Entered: 11/09/2023) |
2023-11-30 | 8 | NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea Cohen Haim-DOJ on behalf of Department of Homeland Security. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Haim-DOJ, Andrea) (Entered: 11/30/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |