Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Immigration Council et al v. U.S. Customs and Border Protection et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2023cv05270
Date Filed2023-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Sallie Kim
PlaintiffAmerican Immigration Council
PlaintiffCenter for Gender & Refugee Studies
Case DescriptionAmerican Immigration Council and the Center for Gender and Refugee Studies, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning CBP policies to manage the flow of migrants within CBP's One Appointments. AIC also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AIC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-161COMPLAINT against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18739640). Filed by Center for Gender & Refugee Studies. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) Modified on 10/18/2023 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-162Certificate of Interested Entities by American Immigration Council (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-163Certificate of Interested Entities by Center for Gender & Refugee Studies (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-164Proposed Summons. (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-165Proposed Summons. (Chakravartula, Neela) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-166Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/30/2023. (sec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-167MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18742504.) filed by American Immigration Council. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/16/2023) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-178MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18744184.) filed by American Immigration Council. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mathur, Suchita) (Filed on 10/17/2023) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2023-10-189Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-10-1810Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (bxl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-10-1811Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2024 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-10-1812Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-10-1813Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2023) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-10-2014Proposed Summons. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/20/2023) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-2015Proposed Summons. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/20/2023) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-2416Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Attorney)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2023) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-2517CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Immigration Council, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies.. (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 10/25/2023) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-11-1018CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Immigration Council, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies (Pinto, Raul) (Filed on 11/10/2023) (Entered: 11/10/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar