Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC JOURNAL v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03091
Date Filed2023-10-16
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPUBLIC JOURNAL
Case DescriptionPublic Journal submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Forest Service for records concerning incendiary devices dropped from unmanned aircraft along the perimeter of the Black Fire. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency told Public Journal that the request would take a year to fulfill and suggested it try to narrow the scope of the request. Public Journal narrowed the scope to a single day. The agency then told Public Journal that there were 21 requests ahead of theirs. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Public Journal filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-161COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10422469) filed by PUBLIC JOURNAL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kane, Maya) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-162NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of PUBLIC JOURNAL (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2023-10-17Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zdp) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2023-11-154NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-155Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-15MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint is due on or before December 22, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/15/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-12-216ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-21MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before January 11, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/21/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2024-01-117Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 01/11/2024)
2024-01-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 29, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/2024. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/11/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar