Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03109
Date Filed2023-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Defense for records concerning computer/Internet services supplied to Joe Biden when he was Vice President. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-171COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10426090) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Defense, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2023-10-172LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2023)
2023-10-18Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zdp) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-10-183SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 10/18/2023)
2023-11-084RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 10/30/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-11-205Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
2023-11-20MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint on or before December 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 11/20/2023. (lcar3) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
2023-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Complaint due by 12/15/2023. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar