Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-17 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10426232) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2023) |
2023-10-17 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/17/2023) |
2023-10-18 | | Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zcb) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-10-18 | 4 | STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on October 18, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 10/18/2023) |
2023-11-14 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/24/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/23/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/07/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/30/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/14/2023) |
2023-11-22 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Lynch, Christopher) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
2023-11-27 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 18, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 27, 2023. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 11/27/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |