Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03131
Date Filed2023-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the EPA for records concerning Administrator Regan's review of former Administrator Wheeler, and his review of Oak Ridge. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked PEER to clarify its request. PEER clarified its request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-191COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10429919) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Defendant Summons, # 3 Summons US AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Atty for DC Summons)(Teubner, Colleen) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-192LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY (Teubner, Colleen) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (zcb) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-193SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zcb) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-11-214Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have to, and including, December 15, 2023, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 11/21/2023. (lcacr1) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer or other response to Complaint due by 12/15/2023. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-12-155ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-15MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed this Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) action on October 19, 2023. Dkt 1. Defendant filed its Answer on December 15, 2023. Dkt. 5. Cases filed under FOIA are exempt from the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3. See LCvR 16.3(b)(10). Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 5, 2024. The Joint Status Report should address, among other things: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for a stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Counsel shall not contact Chambers directly concerning scheduling or other matters, as Chambers personnel will not handle questions relating to the status or scheduling of pending matters, except in case of an emergency. In an emergency, Chambers can be reached at (202) 354-3350. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 12/15/2023. (lcacr1) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/5/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2024-01-056Joint STATUS REPORT by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-01-05MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file another joint status report on or before February 29, 2024 and every 60 days thereafter. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 1/5/2024. (lcacr1) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-01-19Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 2/29/2024. (zcdw) (Entered: 01/19/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar