Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03136
Date Filed2023-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey
PlaintiffFEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM
Case DescriptionFederation for American Immigration Reform submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the agency's initiative, announced July 2, 2021, that identifies and returns previously deported non-citizen veterans. FAIR also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, FAIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-191COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10431531) filed by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, # 2 Summons summons to USAO, # 3 Summons summons to AG, # 4 Summons summons to DHS, # 5 Summons summons to USCIS)(O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-192NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James O'Brien on behalf of FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-193LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION FOR AMERICAN IMMIGRATION REFORM (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zljn) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-194SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-245STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/24/23. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-11-156RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/29/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/28/2023. (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-157RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/29/2023. (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-278Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
2023-11-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 29, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/27/23. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
2023-12-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 11/1/2023 (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2023)
2023-12-0510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/14/2023 (O'Brien, Matthew) (Entered: 12/05/2023)
2023-12-2911ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 12/29/2023)
2023-12-30MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before January 26, 2024, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on February 2, 2024, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/30/23. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 12/30/2023)
2024-01-09Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2024 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 8- In Person before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zglw) (Entered: 01/09/2024)
2024-01-2612Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent Notice, Consent, And Reference to A Magistrate Judge)(Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-01-2613Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.. (Robertson, L'Shauntee) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/26/2024) (zjm). (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-01-2614MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for all purposes. See document for details. It is, accordingly, ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for February 2, 2024, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 8 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/26/24. (lcrdm2) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-01-26CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for all purposes. (zsl) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-01-26MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before March 4, 2024, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. Status Report due by 3/4/2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 1/26/24. (MFB) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar