Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNGUYEN v. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03138
Date Filed2023-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffHUY DANG NGUYEN
Case DescriptionHuy Dang Nguyen submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the incident at which Nguyen was stopped at the Seattle Airport when trying to enter the U.S. on a B1/B2 visitor's visa. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Nguyen filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-191COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10431918) filed by HUY DANG NGUYEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to CBP, # 3 Summons to USAO, # 4 Summons to Garland)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zljn) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-192SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-11-143RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/20/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/19/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/13/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 11/2/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Proof of Service)(Galati, Matthew) (Entered: 11/14/2023)
2023-11-164NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bartholomew on behalf of U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-165MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 5 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed on or before December 20, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-12-146Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the 6 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants responsive pleading shall be filed on or before January 10, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/14/2023. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2024-01-087Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-09MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the 7 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed on or before January 31, 2024. Further motions for extensions of time will be disfavored. The Court ADMONISHES the parties to adhere to Standing Order 9(A) by filing any such requests for extensions at least four business days prior to the relevant deadline. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/9/2024. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/09/2024)
2024-01-258Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 01/25/2024)
2024-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. The Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than March 1, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/29/2024. (hmc) (Entered: 01/29/2024)
2024-02-269Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha) (Entered: 02/26/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar