Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLouise Trauma Center LLC v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DistrictDistrict of Maryland
CityBaltimore
Case Number1:2023cv02846
Date Filed2023-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard D. Bennett
PlaintiffLouise Trauma Center LLC
Case DescriptionLouise Trauma Center submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the Asylum Office Basic Training Course from January 2020 to the present. LTC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, LTC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-201COMPLAINT against USCIS ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10881298.), filed by Louise Trauma Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-232Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
2023-10-263SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louise Trauma Center LLC. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 10/26/2023, answer due 12/26/2023.(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-10-264SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louise Trauma Center LLC. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-11-085SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louise Trauma Center LLC. (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-11-086Consent to Magistrate Judge (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-11-087Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Louise Trauma Center LLC (Cleveland, David) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-12-108Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Through January 10, 2024 by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Ariana) Modified on 12/11/2023 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/10/2023)
2023-12-119ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 Complaint; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services' answer extended through and including 1/10/2024. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/11/2023. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2024-01-1910MOTION for Extension of Time Through February 19, 2024 by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Ariana) Modified on 1/22/2024 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 01/19/2024)
2024-01-1911RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION for Extension of Time Through February 19, 2024 filed by Louise Trauma Center LLC.(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 01/19/2024)
2024-01-1912REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION for Extension of Time Through February 19, 2024 filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Arnold, Ariana) (Entered: 01/19/2024)
2024-01-2613Letter ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer 1 Complaint; United States Citizenship and Immigration Services' answer extended through and including 2/19/2024. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/26/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/2024)
2024-02-2114(REFILED ECF 15) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Ariana) Modified on 2/22/2024 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/21/2024)
2024-02-2115Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Arnold, Ariana) (Entered: 02/21/2024)
2024-02-2616RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 Corrected MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Louise Trauma Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cleveland, David) (Entered: 02/26/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar