Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Cincinnati Enquirer v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictSouthern District of Ohio
CityCincinnati
Case Number1:2023cv00682
Date Filed2023-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Michael R. Barrett
PlaintiffThe Cincinnati Enquirer A Division of Gannett GP Media, Inc
Case DescriptionThe Cincinnati Enquirer submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning Cincinnati Councilwoman Tamaya Dennard's prosecution for accepting a bribe for her vote on the Council. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys denied the request in its entirely based on Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). The Enquirer filed an administrative appeal. The agency upheld the denial. The Enquirer then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-201COMPLAINT for Violation of FOIA-5 U.S.C. 552 against United States Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-9653752), filed by The Cincinnati Enquirer, a division of Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons Form) (Greiner, John) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-202Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer, a division of Gannett GP Media, Inc.. (Greiner, John) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-20If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (bjc) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-203Summons Issued as to United States Department of Justice. (bjc) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2024-02-014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Enquirer is ORDERED to show cause, in writing and within twenty-one (21) days, why the complaint should not be dismissed for failure of service. Alternatively, The Enquirer is INSTRUCTED to notify the Court, in writing and within twenty-one (21) days, should it require additional time to cure a failure of service, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i)(4)(A). Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/1/2024. (kkz) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-085MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/8/2024. by Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Darren W. Ford) (Ford, Darren) (Entered: 02/08/2024)
2024-02-14NOTATION ORDER: For good cause shown, Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to effectuate service is GRANTED. Plaintiff The Cincinnati Enquirer shall now have up to and including 4/8/24 to perfect service on Defendant United States Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 2/14/24. (kkz) (Entered: 02/14/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar