Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMichael Graybill v. National Security Agency et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2023cv08754
Date Filed2023-10-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
PlaintiffMichael Robert Graybill
Case DescriptionMichael Graybill submitted FOIA requests to the National Security Agency and the CIA for records concerning himself. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Graybill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNational Security Agency NSA
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency CIA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-171COMPLAINT against Defendants Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency.Case assigned to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian., filed by plaintiff Michael Robert Graybill. (Attachments: # 1 CV-71, # 2 Summons) (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-172REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Michael Robert Graybill. (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-173NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: Complaint - (Discovery), 1 . The following error(s) was/were found: No interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-194NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-195NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-196Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 10/19/2023)
2023-10-207ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED.; granting 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support. (aco) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar