Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNicolette Glazer v. United States Department of State
DistrictCentral District of California
CityEastern Division - Riverside
Case Number5:2023cv02159
Date Filed2023-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge George H Wu
PlaintiffNicolette Glazer
Case DescriptionNicolette Glazer, an attorney, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the number of diversity visas issued each month. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Glazer filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-201COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-36264198 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Nicolette Glazer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Attorney Nicolette Glazer added to party Nicolette Glazer(pty:pla))(Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-202CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nicolette Glazer. (Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-203Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff Nicolette Glazer. (Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-204NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-205NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-206Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-207NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request 3 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect days for defendant to serve a response on Plaintiff entered. If the case is filed under the Freedom of Information Act, Within 30 days should be reflected on summons. Clerk has attached proper FOIA Summons for filer as a courtesy. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Request for a FOIA Case) (lh) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-208Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, 7 filed by Plaintiff Nicolette Glazer. (Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 10/20/2023)
2023-10-23930 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant United States Department of State. (aco) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
2023-10-2410STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-2911PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Nicolette Glazer, upon Plaintiff United States Department of State served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/24/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Service of Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Anderson. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to R Martin. Service was executed in compliance with statute not specified. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Glazer, Nicolette) (Entered: 10/29/2023)
2023-11-2112STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 8, 2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah L. Cronin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Sarah L Cronin added to party United States Department of State(pty:dft))(Cronin, Sarah) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-11-2213ORDER 12 by Senior District Judge George H Wu. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to and including January 8, 2024. (lom) (Entered: 11/22/2023)
2023-12-1814Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 8, 2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah L. Cronin, # 2 Proposed Order)(Cronin, Sarah) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2023-12-1915ORDER 14 by Judge George H Wu. IT IS ORDERED that the time for Defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to and including March 8, 2024. There will be no further continuances granted. (lom) (Entered: 12/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar