Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE v. U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03171
Date Filed2023-10-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffFUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE
Case DescriptionFunctional Government Initiative submitted six FOIA requests to the FDA for records concerning the agency's human food programs and its tobacco program. The agency acknowledged receipt but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of the six requests, FGI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-231COMPLAINT against U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10439320) filed by FUNCTIONAL GOVERNMENT INITIATIVE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 10/23/2023)
2023-10-24Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zdp) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-242SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-11-203Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
2023-11-21MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by December 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 11/21/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 11/21/2023)
2023-12-274ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION.(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 12/27/2023)
2023-12-27MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/27/2023. (lccrc1) (Entered: 12/27/2023)
2024-01-125Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. FOOD AND DRUG ADMINISTRATION. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 5 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby directed to file a further joint status report by March 12, 2024, and every 60 days thereafter. Given the number of requests and potentially large volume of responsive documents, the parties are encouraged to discuss tailoring the requests prior to the next status report. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/12/2024. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/12/2024 (lsj) (Entered: 01/30/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar