Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHERITAGE FOUNDATION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03179
Date Filed2023-10-24
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffHERITAGE FOUNDATION
PlaintiffMIKE HOWELL
Case DescriptionThe Heritage Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning itself with the search limited to the Office of the Secretary, the Office of Public Affairs, and the Center for Prevention Programs and Partnerships' Targeted Violence and Terrorism Prevention Program. The requests were limited by date from January 2021 to the present. The Heritage Foundation also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency asked the Heritage Foundation to narrow its request. It narrowed the request by saying that it did not want press clippings. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Heritage Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-241COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10441057) filed by HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-242LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HERITAGE FOUNDATION (Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-243NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Everett Dewey on behalf of HERITAGE FOUNDATION, MIKE HOWELL (Dewey, Samuel) (Entered: 10/24/2023)
2023-10-25Case Assigned to Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (zdp) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-10-254SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 10/25/2023)
2023-11-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/02/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-076RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 11/1/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-077RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/2/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/2/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt, # 2 Exhibit USPS Tracker Printout)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-168NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Hudak on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-169NOTICE of Non-Service by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 11/16/2023)
2023-11-1710RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/17/2023. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/17/2023. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Printout of Email to Civil Process Clerk)(Edlow, Joseph) (Entered: 11/17/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar