Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10447191) filed by ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS, INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-25 | 3 | NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of ADVANCE MAGAZINE PUBLISHERS, INC. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 10/25/2023) |
2023-10-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zljn) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
2023-10-26 | 4 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 10/26/2023) |
2023-11-22 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of All Defendants (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
2023-11-22 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE NAVY.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
2023-11-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a Complaint and an Answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than January 17, 2024. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/22/23. (lce) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
2023-11-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 11/22/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |