Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRIGSBY v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03209
Date Filed2023-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffMARK JEFFERSON RIGSBY
Case DescriptionMark Rigby submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the after-actin report on the U.S. withdrawal from Afghanistan that was submitted to Congress. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Rigby filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-10-261COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10450056) filed by MARK JEFFERSON RIGSBY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quaranto, Lance) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/30/2023) (zdp). (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-10-262NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of MARK JEFFERSON RIGSBY (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 10/26/2023)
2023-10-30Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zdp) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-10-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zdp) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-10-304STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/30/2023. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-12-085ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Siler, Jacob) (Entered: 12/08/2023)
2023-12-11MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before January 5, 2024, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on January 12, 2024, at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 8, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/11/. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-22MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for January 12, 2024, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED to January 30, 2024 at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/22/2023. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2024-01-056Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Siler, Jacob) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
2024-01-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 6 , it is hereby ORDERED that: (1) the initial scheduling conference currently set for January 30, 2024 is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for March 13, 2024, at 1:30 p.m., in Courtroom 8 and (2) the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before March 5, 2024, updating the Court on the status of case and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/7/2024. (lcrdm3) (Entered: 01/07/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar