Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2023-10-27 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10453607) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-10-27 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 10/27/2023) |
2023-10-30 | | Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zljn) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-10-30 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zljn) (Entered: 10/30/2023) |
2023-11-20 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/3/2023. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/3/2023.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/14/2023., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 11/13/2023 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Di Liberto, Meredith) (Entered: 11/20/2023) |
2023-12-04 | 5 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 12/04/2023) |
2023-12-06 | 6 | ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before December 20, 2023. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/06/2023. (lcapm3) (Entered: 12/06/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |