Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT v. UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03525
Date Filed2023-11-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionGovernment Accountability & Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning emails and attachments for named officials. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, GAO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-271COMPLAINT Under the Freedom of Information Act against CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10516480) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Hardin, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
2023-11-28Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-282SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-12-013NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Cochran Horner on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY & OVERSIGHT (Horner, Christopher) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-044STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2023. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/04/2023)
2023-12-245NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/24/2023)
2023-12-246MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/24/2023)
2023-12-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendants' 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, the defendants shall file their answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before January 23, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 26, 2023. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2024-01-237ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CENTERS FOR MEDICARE & MEDICAID SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES.(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-01-23MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Meet and Confer report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the Meet and Confer report on or before February 22, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 23, 2024. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar