Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2023cv03543
Date Filed2023-11-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffAMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE
Case DescriptionAmerican Immigrant Investor Alliance submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning various policies and initiative emanating from a GAO Report. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked for clarification. AIIA provided clarification but after hearing nothing further from the agency, AIIA filed suit,
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (USCIS)
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2023-11-281COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-10519888) filed by AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Pratt, John) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-282LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN IMMIGRANT INVESTOR ALLIANCE (Pratt, John) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-28Case Assigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. (zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-11-283SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrtw) (Entered: 11/28/2023)
2023-12-214NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-215Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2023-12-266MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the Complaint shall be extended through and including February 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on December 26, 2023. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 12/26/2023)
2024-01-317ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/31/2024)
2024-02-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the Parties confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings, which shall include a proposed schedule for the processing and release of responsive records or for briefing dispositive motions, by February 15, 2024. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 1, 2024. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-148Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/14/2024)
2024-02-219SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that the Parties shall file a joint status report by April 22, 2024, and every 90 days thereafter until further order of the Court. See document for scheduling order and information concerning discovery and case procedures. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 21, 2024. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 02/21/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar